Public Service Commission

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0035 / CH0581Electric Reliability - Priorities and FundingDelegate Miller, W.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581Economic Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0048Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and StudyDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0078Public Service Commission - Participant CompensationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0331
    (SB0280)
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage DataDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0332Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart MetersDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0447
    (SB0343)
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and StudyDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0729
    (SB0979)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0731Generating Stations - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consideration of Water UsageDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0928 / CH0078
    (SB1044 / CH0077)
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - ReportDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0931
    (SB0530)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1076
    (SB0521)
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory CommitteeDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Agriculture (M4)
HB1168Electricity - Certificate - Wind Turbines - LimitationSouthern Maryland DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1192
    (SB0786)
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1318
    (SB0972)
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination ExtensionDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1463
    (SB1020)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1496Baltimore City - Consumer Relations - Smart MetersDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0280
    (HB0331)
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage DataSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0343
    (HB0447)
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and StudySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0361Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - Best Available TechnologySenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0362Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - State PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0521
    (HB1076)
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative ProgramSenator PinskyIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters Agriculture (M4)
SB0530
    (HB0931)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0724Electric Companies - Contact Voltage - Surveys - Revision to The Deanna Camille Green Act of 2012Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0786
    (HB1192)
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot ProgramSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0880Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart MetersSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0972
    (HB1318)
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination ExtensionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0979
    (HB0729)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB1020
    (HB1463)
Solar Farms - Construction Requirements - ExemptionsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1044 / CH0077
    (HB0928 / CH0078)
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - ReportSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.