Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0244 / CH0089Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena PowerChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0442 / CH0052
    (SB0415 / CH0051)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0443 / CH0050
    (SB0413 / CH0049)
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care ProvidersDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0473Truth in Sentencing Task ForceDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0541
    (SB0571)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0698 / CH0241
    (SB0356 / CH0240)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudyDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0952
    (SB0782)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Legal CounselDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0961State Government - Maryland Public Information Act - Required Denials Regarding Firearm Dealers, Owners, and Permit HoldersDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1138
    (SB0778)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1201Baltimore City - New Youth Detention Facility - Commission on Delinquency and Youth Detention PreventionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1242Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - BillingDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1267Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1350Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry ProgramsDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1377
    (SB0956)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB1408 / CH0417Family Law - Criminal History Records Checks - Student TeachersDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0356 / CH0240
    (HB0698 / CH0241)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudySenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Finance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0413 / CH0049
    (HB0443 / CH0050)
Criminal History Records Checks - Informal Child Care ProvidersSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0415 / CH0051
    (HB0442 / CH0052)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0491
    (HB0544)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0778
    (HB1138)
Correctional Services - Inmate Welfare Fund - Telephone Financial AssistanceSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0782
    (HB0952)
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - ContractsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0956
    (HB1377)
State Government - Mental Health and Law Enforcement Advisory BoardSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0989Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug TestingSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1001 / CH0079Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset ExtensionSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.