Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0200 / CH0407
    (SB0189)
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph ExaminationDelegate ClusterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0301
    (SB0414)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0622
    (SB0603)
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Conditional ParoleDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0694 / CH0268
    (SB0286)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0980
    (SB0340)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsDelegate McCrayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1237 / CH0305Police and Correctional Training Commissions - Applicants - Criminal History Records ChecksChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0189
    (HB0200 / CH0407)
State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Polygraph ExaminationSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0286
    (HB0694 / CH0268)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - MembershipSenator MannoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0340
    (HB0980)
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-FelonsSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0414
    (HB0301)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0603
    (HB0622)
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional ParoleSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0912Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.