Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0164 / CH0098State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current EmployeesChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0254Division of Parole and Probation - Revocation Prohibited - CitationDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0255Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Approval of GovernorDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0358 / CH0077
    (SB0629 / CH0076)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0498Correctional Services - Senior Reentry Coordinating CouncilDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0534 / CH0489
    (SB0924)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealDelegate SanchezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0630Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked LicenseDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0914Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle ProsequiDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0956
    (SB0741)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0979
    (SB0923)
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition and Task ForceDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1180 / CH0597
    (SB0946 / CH0596)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1292State and Local Correctional Facilities - Release - Notification of Immigration StatusDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1298Baltimore County - Release From Local Correctional Facilities - Notification of Immigration StatusDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1317Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle ProsequiDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1489
    (SB0171)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0087 / CH0340Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0171
    (HB1489)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0327Natural Resources Police - Conditions of Sentencing, Probation, Parole, or Mandatory Release Supervision - DatabaseSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0590Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - RestrictionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0629 / CH0076
    (HB0358 / CH0077)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0741
    (HB0956)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0783Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)Senator RosapepeIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0804State Government - Occupational Licensing of Ex-Offenders - Transfer of Statutory ProvisionsSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0923
    (HB0979)
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of ProhibitionSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0924
    (HB0534 / CH0489)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0943
    (HB1001)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0946 / CH0596
    (HB1180 / CH0597)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.