Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0277
    (SB0223)
Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration RequirementsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0564Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0847Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Benefits for Individuals Who Are Incarcerated or InstitutionalizedDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0944
    (SB0469)
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - EstablishmentDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0981
    (SB0664)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipAllegany County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1021Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1081
    (SB0650)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonIn the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1148Face Recognition ActDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1152Task Force to Examine Reinstatement of the Death PenaltyDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1157
    (SB0879)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1329
    (SB0967)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1388Sexual Crimes - Video Games - Prohibited Conduct and Warnings to Game DevelopersDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1424
    (SB0727)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1564
    (SB0659)
Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary ConfinementDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0011Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing BoardChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0045 / CH0195Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records ChecksChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0084Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0181Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural ResourcesSenator SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0223
    (HB0277)
Criminal Law and Procedure - Sex Offenders and Possession of Child Pornography - Penalties and Registration RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0243Correctional Services - Inmates - Financial Literacy TrainingSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB0469
    (HB0944)
Correctional Services - Prison Artists Marketplace Program - EstablishmentSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0650
    (HB1081)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0659
    (HB1564)
Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary ConfinementSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0664
    (HB0981)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0727
    (HB1424)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - NotificationSenator SmithIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0879
    (HB1157)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pilot Program and ConditionsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0967
    (HB1329)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1129Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Licensing of Outpatient Programs and Provision of Naloxone KitsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:41 P.M.