Public Works

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0191 / CH0438
    (SB0047 / CH0437)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0252State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0288 / CH0096St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0330
    (SB0555)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0546
    (SB0508 / CH0060)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0650 / CH0630Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Prevailing Wage MC/PG 112-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 630Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0802
    (SB0458 / CH0056)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0827Environment - Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure - FundDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0846
    (SB0588 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0883
    (SB0398)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit CourtDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1098 / CH0402
    (SB0290)
Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage LawDelegate OlszewskiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1319Procurement - Competitive Sealed Proposals - Construction Contracts - Economic Inclusion PlansDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1325Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisDelegate WoodIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1381
    (SB0953)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of Seat Pleasant Public Works FacilityDelegate SwainIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1486Procurement - Occupational Safety and Health PrequalificationDelegate McHaleIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0047 / CH0437
    (HB0191 / CH0438)
Procurement - Purchase of American Manufactured GoodsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0290
    (HB1098 / CH0402)
Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage LawSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsFinance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0398
    (HB0883)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit CourtSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0458 / CH0056
    (HB0802)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 56Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0508 / CH0060
    (HB0546)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0555
    (HB0330)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0588 / CH0063
    (HB0846)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0702 / CH0529
    (HB1337 / CH0530)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0906Transportation - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0953
    (HB1381)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of Seat Pleasant Public Works FacilitySenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.