Public Works

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0075 / CH0356
    (SB0162 / CH0355)
Gas Companies - Infrastructure Replacement Projects - Amendment to a PlanDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Economic Matters
1/21/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0205 / CH0254
    (SB0296)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0295Electricity - Explanation of Bill ChargesDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0327Public Service Commission Reform ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0383 / CH0674
    (SB0426 / CH0673)
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of AnnapolisDelegate BuschEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0527Harford County - Department of Public Works - Smart Water MetersDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0546
    (SB0510)
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure InvestmentsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0571Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0670 / CH0274Baltimore City - Remediation of Illegal Dumping - ReportDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0687Prevailing Wage - Payroll Records - Submission by ContractorsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0689
    (SB1009 / CH0707)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated DamagesDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0721
    (SB0711)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Delegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0743Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task ForceDelegate Robinson, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0792
    (SB0914)
Public Work Contracts - Payroll Reporting Requirements (The Transparency Act of 2016)Delegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0836Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to SafetyDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0860Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability to the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of MarylandDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1155Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1351Public Service Companies and Utility Companies - Entering on Property - Notice to OwnerDelegate BrooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1459
    (SB0440)
Prevailing Wage - Career and Technology Centers or STEM and STEAM Classrooms (Student Preparedness Act of 2016)Delegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1575Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates PG/MC 119-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsBi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0007Prevailing Wage Law - Applicability - Elementary and Secondary School ConstructionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0162 / CH0355
    (HB0075 / CH0356)
Gas Companies - Infrastructure Replacement Projects - Amendment to a PlanSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Finance
1/26/2016 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0296
    (HB0205 / CH0254)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsCarroll County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0426 / CH0673
    (HB0383 / CH0674)
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of AnnapolisSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0440
    (HB1459)
Prevailing Wage - Application to Career and Technology Centers or STEM and STEAM ClassroomsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0510
    (HB0546)
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure InvestmentsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0711
    (HB0721)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0826 / CH0580
    (HB0403 / CH0581)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Senator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0914
    (HB0792)
Prevailing Wage Law - Payroll Reporting RequirementsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1009 / CH0707
    (HB0689)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated DamagesSenator BensonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.