Public Works, Board of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0119
    (SB0708)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Delegate MorhaimIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsDelegate JonesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0336Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting FixturesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0698Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB10302-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or HotlineDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1211State Budget - Board of Public Works - Notice of Reductions in AppropriationsDelegate KormanIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB1224 / CH0303Procurement - Contracts for Pretreatment and Removal of Snow and IceChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0601 / CH0371
    (HB0130)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
SB0708
    (HB0119)
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)Senator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.