Public Works, Board of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0107Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family HomesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0155 / CH0114Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Easement TerminationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0390 / CH0586
    (SB0310 / CH0587)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructureSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0426 / CH0589
    (SB0311 / CH0588)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0537Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems and Funding for Wastewater Treatment Facilities and Sewerage SystemsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0593 / CH0800
    (SB0348 / CH0799)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0845Education - Public School Indoor Air QualityDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1021 / CH0590Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0310 / CH0587
    (HB0390 / CH0586)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructurePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0348 / CH0799
    (HB0593 / CH0800)
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of ErrorSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0538Public School Construction - Regulations - Equitable Distribution of Projects and ImprovementsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0999
    (HB1443)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.