Racing

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0481
    (SB0578)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHorse Racing (C6)
HB0606
    (SB0178 / CH0500)
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital ExpendituresDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0662Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair HillCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0895
    (SB0655)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0977
    (SB0708)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race CourseCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0989Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1657
    (SB1166)
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural EventDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0178 / CH0500
    (HB0606)
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital ExpendituresSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0228 / CH0452Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0578
    (HB0481)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHorse Racing (C6)
SB0655
    (HB0895)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0708
    (HB0977)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race CourseCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1166
    (HB1657)
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural EventSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.