Raffles

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0069 / CH0007
    (SB0006 / CH0006)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0344
    (SB0130)
Harford County - Charitable GamingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0414 / CH0228
    (SB0315 / CH0227)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0006 / CH0006
    (HB0069 / CH0007)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0130
    (HB0344)
Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator GlassmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0315 / CH0227
    (HB0414 / CH0228)
Frederick County - Gaming PermitsSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.