Railroads

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1184
    (SB0847)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1432 / CH0684Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1433 / CH0685Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0847
    (HB1184)
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.