Railroads

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0573Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0619Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - ProhibitionDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0835Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1123Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014Delegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1326
    (SB0754)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1427Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's CountyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0565Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in DeathSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0754
    (HB1326)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1035Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line ExtensionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.