Railroads

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0040St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0092
    (SB0275)
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0434Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0572Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0612Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - PenaltyDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0735
    (SB0763)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0891
    (SB1035)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1023
    (SB0966)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of FrederickDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1338Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 CorridorDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1434Rail Safety Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1598
    (SB1120)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueDelegate ParrottIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0275
    (HB0092)
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0731Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Aberdeen B&O Railroad StationSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0763
    (HB0735)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0966
    (HB1023)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of FrederickSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1035
    (HB0891)
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery RateSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1120
    (HB1598)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueSenator ReillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.