Railroads

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Criminal Law - Assault - Public Transportation Operator and PenaltiesDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0180Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewDelegate SteinIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0209Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0232Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Maglev - Hearing and Approval Requirements PG 402-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0312Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering WithDelegate DavisIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0343
    (SB0537)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0372
    (SB0277)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0548
    (SB1073)
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - RequirementsDelegate HealeyIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0637
    (SB1004)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0638
    (SB1005)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0849
    (SB1133)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0918Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0978
    (SB0624)
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Purple Line Construction ZoneDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1175Public Safety - National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK) Police ForceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1314Healthy Working Families Act – Exemptions – Modifications (Healthy Working Families Exemption Equity Act)Delegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1742Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County ApprovalDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0277
    (HB0372)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0537
    (HB0343)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22–18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0624
    (HB0978)
State Income and Property Tax Credits – Purple Line Construction ZoneSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0834Transportation - Transit Service - State GrantsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB1003Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - LimitationsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1004
    (HB0637)
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval RequirementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB1005
    (HB0638)
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - AgreementsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB1073
    (HB0548)
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - ApplicationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1133
    (HB0849)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

April 11, 2018 2:53 P.M.