Real Estate

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023
    (SB0176)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0040Residential Property Sales - Disclosure of Utility ConsumptionDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (23-23)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0335 / CH0574
    (SB0900 / CH0573)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0340
    (SB0189)
Residential Real Property Sales - Property Tax DisclaimerDelegate HoganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeDelegate Washington, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0883
    (SB0398)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit CourtDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1048Real Property - Sale of Property - Lead-Contaminated Dust Test RequiredDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1097
    (SB0397)
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of FeesDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersReal Property (N1)
HB1132 / CH0074
    (SB0749 / CH0073)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1324
    (SB0396)
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts VoidDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1347
    (SB0138)
Build Maryland Tax Credit ActDelegate McHaleIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1354Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural CausesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0138
    (HB1347)
Build Maryland Tax Credit ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0176
    (HB0023)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0189
    (HB0340)
Residential Real Property Sales - Property Tax DisclaimerSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0375 / CH0247
    (HB0785)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0396
    (HB1324)
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts VoidSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0397
    (HB1097)
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of FeesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0398
    (HB0883)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit CourtSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0449Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0749 / CH0073
    (HB1132 / CH0074)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational ChangesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0900 / CH0573
    (HB0335 / CH0574)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.