Real Estate

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0055Business Occupations – Obligations of Real Estate Brokers – Voter RegistrationDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0064 / CH0759Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management CompaniesDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 759Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0091Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear ExceptionDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0200 / CH0160
    (SB0064 / CH0159)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0363
    (SB0305)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1470Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer BillingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1481 / CH0680
    (SB0648 / CH0681)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1482 / CH0078
    (SB0846 / CH0077)
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of DisabilityDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Economic Matters
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1608Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust AccountsDelegate MorganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0064 / CH0159
    (HB0200 / CH0160)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0305
    (HB0363)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0648 / CH0681
    (HB1481 / CH0680)
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0846 / CH0077
    (HB1482 / CH0078)
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of DisabilitySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:40 A.M.