Reapportionment and Redistricting

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0233Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0832
    (SB0361)
Congressional Districting ProcessDelegate NormanIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1269
    (SB0240)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0240
    (HB1269)
Task Force to Study Redistricting in MarylandSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0361
    (HB0832)
Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0713Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st CenturySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.