Reapportionment and Redistricting

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009
    (SB0112)
Baltimore City - Police Districts - RedistrictingDelegate McCrayIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0367Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0385
    (SB0252)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0535House Legislative Districts - Single MemberDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0622Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0962Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0112
    (HB0009)
Baltimore City - Police Districts - RedistrictingSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0146Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0252
    (HB0385)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

May 8, 2017 4:55 P.M.