Reapportionment and Redistricting

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0356
    (SB0307)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0440Baltimore City - Police Districts - RedistrictingDelegate McCrayIn the Senate - Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2018 - 7:30 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0477Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0537Potomac Compact for Fair RepresentationDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1022Congressional Districts - StandardsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1328General Assembly - Establishment of House Districts (Maryland Fair Representation Act)Delegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1362House Legislative Districts - Single MemberDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0307
    (HB0356)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

April 9, 2018 6:38 P.M.