Recordation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0372 / CH0453
    (SB0202 / CH0452)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0419 / CH0370Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid TaxDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0794 / CH0640
    (SB0696)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 640Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0946Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1008Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013Delegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1236 / CH0532
    (SB0730 / CH0531)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling InterestDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0202 / CH0452
    (HB0372 / CH0453)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0436 / CH0267
    (HB1209 / CH0268)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0696
    (HB0794 / CH0640)
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - LiensSenator StoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0730 / CH0531
    (HB1236 / CH0532)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling InterestSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0994Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.