Recordation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0044Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability CompanyDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0488 / CH0487Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - AppealsDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0508
    (SB0330)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0576 / CH0398
    (SB0525 / CH0399)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0762Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0920 / CH0396
    (SB0509 / CH0395)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0970 / CH0566
    (SB0591 / CH0565)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1226 / CH0224
    (SB0597 / CH0223)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1446 / CH0653State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - ProhibitionsDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0330
    (HB0508)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0456Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0509 / CH0395
    (HB0920 / CH0396)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0525 / CH0399
    (HB0576 / CH0398)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0591 / CH0565
    (HB0970 / CH0566)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0597 / CH0223
    (HB1226 / CH0224)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1047 / CH0602Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic ViolenceSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.