Recordings

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0251
    (SB0785)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0435Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0825Public Service Commission - Hearings and Proceedings - Video and Audio RecordingsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0938Transit Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1436
    (SB0967)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1465Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0067 / CH0017Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control PurposesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0068Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality AssuranceChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0182Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - ProhibitionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0389Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0785
    (HB0251)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0967
    (HB1436)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.