Recordings

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0043Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0046Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing HearingsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0054Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0169
    (SB0091)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Delegate KormanIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0483Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child VictimDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0726Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0843
    (SB0635)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0849
    (SB0615)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0933General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1445
    (SB0775)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop LicensesDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1518Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0091
    (HB0169)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0615
    (HB0849)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0635
    (HB0843)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0775
    (HB1445)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist LicenseHarford County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1034 / CH0816Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Funding and Video StreamingSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.