Recycling

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0135Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - RecyclingDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0184 / CH0279
    (SB0484 / CH0278)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell RecyclingDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1087Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage ContainersDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1088 / CH0146Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - RevisionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1266
    (SB0799)
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio StandardDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1369
    (SB0925)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift ProjectDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1440 / CH0686Recycling - Composting FacilitiesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0484 / CH0278
    (HB0184 / CH0279)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell RecyclingSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0799
    (HB1266)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0925
    (HB1369)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift ProjectSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1049 / CH0602Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean CitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.