Referendum

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0017
    (SB0518)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling PlacesDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0030Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory ProvisionsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0059Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0113
    (SB0173)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0163
    (SB0172)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0363Tax Increases - Majority Vote RequiredDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0441Courts - Death Penalty CourtDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0446Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0464 / CH0245
    (SB0371 / CH0244)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0567Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0574Office of the Inspector General - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0731Capital Projects - Eliminating Individual Bond BillsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0788
    (SB0756)
Living Wage Law - Application and EnforcementDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0864Real Property - Eminent Domain - Limitations on Condemnation AuthorityDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersReal Property (N1)
HB1199Citizens' Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1227General Assembly - Appointment to Vacancy in Office - ProcedureDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1327 / CH0151Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - CollectionDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0108Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0172
    (HB0163)
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' CourtAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0295Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0371 / CH0244
    (HB0464 / CH0245)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0518
    (HB0017)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling PlacesSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0545Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0706Referendum PetitionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0756
    (HB0788)
Living Wage Law - Application and EnforcementSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.