Referendum

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0164General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0233Tax Increases - Super Majority Vote RequiredDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0372Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed EstablishmentsDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Gaming (C7)
HB0481Office of the Inspector General - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0489Municipalities - Incorporation Referendums - Special ElectionsDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
HB0651Courts - Aggravated Murder CourtDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0690 / CH0418Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises ConsumptionGarrett County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0711Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds VoteDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0726Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0729
    (SB0979)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0734General Assembly - Removal of Members - IncarcerationDelegate DwyerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0754Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0817Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0915
    (SB0740)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0970General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1097 / CH0445Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises ConsumptionGarrett County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 445Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1176Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and BoundariesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1195General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1213Maryland Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1327
    (SB0582)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1412Election Law - Petitions - Advance DeterminationsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1415 / CH0261
    (SB1017)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate KaiserAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 261Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Elections (G1)
HB1475Election Law - Signing a Petition - Required InformationDelegate BoboIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)
SB0319Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0414General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0582
    (HB1327)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0636Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0848Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation SummarySenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0979
    (HB0729)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB1017
    (HB1415 / CH0261)
Chief Executive Officer or County Executive - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Elections (G1)
SB1114Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1115Members of the General Assembly - Responsibilities and Eligibility to VoteSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.