Referendum

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0084Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0345
    (SB0423)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling PlaceDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0348Montgomery County - Staggered Election Terms for Members of the County Council MC 4-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0361General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0367Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessDelegate ReznikIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0535House Legislative Districts - Single MemberDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0552Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0579Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0594Landlord and Tenant - Candidate Signs and Proposition SignsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0706General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0724Circuit Court Judges - ElectionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0766
    (SB1003)
State Officers - Year of ElectionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0826Circuit Court Judges - Selection and TenureDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0989Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1236
    (SB0891)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1505Constitutional Amendment - Clarification of Referendum Process - Veto OverrideDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1585Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate SzeligaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0423
    (HB0345)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling PlaceSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0690State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0862Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and ReferendaSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0891
    (HB1236)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1003
    (HB0766)
State Officers - Year of ElectionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

April 10, 2017 11:39 P.M.