Refuse Disposal

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0184 / CH0279
    (SB0484 / CH0278)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell RecyclingDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0197
    (SB0271)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0341
    (SB0513)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited ActsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0554 / CH0501
    (SB0563 / CH0500)
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of ApplicationsDelegate SchuhApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0807Environment - Landfill Operator - Completion of Training CourseDelegate FrushIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0959
    (SB0676 / CH0304)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1266
    (SB0799)
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio StandardDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1440 / CH0686Recycling - Composting FacilitiesChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0271
    (HB0197)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - PenaltiesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0484 / CH0278
    (HB0184 / CH0279)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell RecyclingSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0513
    (HB0341)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited ActsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0563 / CH0500
    (HB0554 / CH0501)
Environment and Public Utilities - Notice to Neighboring Jurisdictions of ApplicationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0591Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal InformationSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0676 / CH0304
    (HB0959)
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of InformationSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0799
    (HB1266)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceSenator MiddletonIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1049 / CH0602Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean CitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.