Refuse Disposal

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and DispositionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0240
    (SB0056)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Environment (M3)
HB0386
    (SB0390 / CH0493)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0409Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited ActsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0718
    (SB0707)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Delegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1081Composting and Anaerobic Digestion Facilities - Yard Waste and Food ResidualsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1210
    (SB0706)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1247
    (SB0981)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1373Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on IssuanceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1506 / CH0459Wicomico County - Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal AuthorityDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1539
    (SB1096)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanDelegate SmigielIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Environment (M3)
SB0056
    (HB0240)
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task ForceSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0127 / CH0036Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation ProjectChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0390 / CH0493
    (HB0386)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsBaltimore City SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0566Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public ServiceSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0706
    (HB1210)
Environment - Permit Determinations - Cumulative Impact AssessmentsSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0707
    (HB0718)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0981
    (HB1247)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1096
    (HB1539)
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation PlanSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.