Refuse Disposal

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0124 / CH0376Environment - Solid Waste and Recycling FacilitiesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0171 / CH0384
    (SB0099 / CH0383)
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - StudyDelegate RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0466
    (SB0870)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0511 / CH0535
    (SB0218 / CH0536)
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and ProceedingsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0674
    (SB0168)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0771 / CH0216
    (SB0262 / CH0215)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsDelegate Miller, W.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0886
    (SB0890)
Environment - Refuse Disposal Systems - Public Notice and Hearing RequirementsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0952 / CH0753
    (SB0707 / CH0752)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Delegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 753Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1070Department of the Environment - End-of-Life Management of Mattresses - StudyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1224Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and InspectionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1239
    (SB0280)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingDelegate FrushIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1300 / CH0419Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider DisplacementCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1440 / CH0146Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal ContractsCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1572Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 422-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0099 / CH0383
    (HB0171 / CH0384)
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - StudySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0168
    (HB0674)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0218 / CH0536
    (HB0511 / CH0535)
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and ProceedingsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0262 / CH0215
    (HB0771 / CH0216)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0280
    (HB1239)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEnvironment (M3)
SB0707 / CH0752
    (HB0952 / CH0753)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Senator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0870
    (HB0466)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0890
    (HB0886)
Environment - Refuse Disposal Systems - Public Notice and Hearing RequirementsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:52 A.M.