Reimbursement Rates

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0174
    (SB0247)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0303 / CH0365Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead PoisoningDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0361 / CH0368Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0373
    (SB0151 / CH0193)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationDelegate Haddaway-RiccioVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0736
    (SB0928)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0808
    (SB0680)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0931
    (SB0496 / CH0280)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1242Correctional Services - Inmate Health Care Services - BillingDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1245
    (SB0822)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1329Medical Assistance Programs - Fraud and Abuse PreventionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1389
    (SB0914)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0151 / CH0193
    (HB0373)
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate RegulationSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0247
    (HB0174)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0496 / CH0280
    (HB0931)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - TelemedicineSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 280Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0680
    (HB0808)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0820 / CH0561
    (HB0767 / CH0562)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0822
    (HB1245)
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0914
    (HB1389)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceFinanceWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0928
    (HB0736)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1073Task Force to Evaluate the Quality of Patient Care Under a Capitated Payment SystemSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.