Religion

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0081
    (SB1035)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Rebirth Community CenterDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0109
    (SB0102)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Holy Trinity Episcopal Day School Air-Supported Structure (Athletic & Arts Center)Delegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0126 / CH0350Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - ScopeDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0168
    (SB0716)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly United Methodist Church Kitchen and Public Accessibility ProjectDelegate IveyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0169
    (SB0718)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Ann's Security Renovations Delegate IveyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0590Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at RetailDelegate AroraIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0606
    (SB0733)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of RenewalDelegate GriffithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0667 / CH0262
    (SB0422 / CH0261)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0939
    (SB0402)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 RenovationsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1401
    (SB0921)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy RestorationsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1446
    (SB0529)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0063 / CH0014Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational InstitutionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0102
    (HB0109)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Holy Trinity Episcopal Day School Air-Supported Structure (Athletic & Arts Center)Senator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0402
    (HB0939)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Wasserman Residence Phase 2 RenovationsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0422 / CH0261
    (HB0667 / CH0262)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2013 - 11:30 a.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0529
    (HB1446)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Leadenhall Community Outreach CenterSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0716
    (HB0168)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cheverly United Methodist Church Kitchen and Public Accessibility ProjectSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0718
    (HB0169)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Ann's Security RenovationsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0733
    (HB0606)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of RenewalSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0921
    (HB1401)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Melvin J. Berman Hebrew Academy RestorationsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1035
    (HB0081)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Rebirth Community CenterSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.