Reproductive Matters

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0876
    (SB0918)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1083 / CH0028
    (SB1081 / CH0810)
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of CareDelegate PendergrassEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1557
    (SB1156)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0096Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based MethodsSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0918
    (HB0876)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1081 / CH0810
    (HB1083 / CH0028)
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of CareSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
SB1156
    (HB1557)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.