Reproductive Matters

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0437
    (SB0033 / CH0438)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based MethodsDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0780
    (SB0744)
Insurance - Contraceptive Coverage - Consumer InformationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0908 / CH0715
    (SB0271 / CH0716)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1518 / CH0308Public Health - Maternal Mortality Review Program - Report and Stakeholder MeetingsDelegate WilkinsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1650Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1727Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - CoverageDelegate Miller, A.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HJ0010Decreasing Surgical BirthsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0033 / CH0438
    (HB0249 / CH0437)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based MethodsSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0137 / CH0065
    (HB0135 / CH0064)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0271 / CH0716
    (HB0908 / CH0715)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 716Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0444 / CH0708Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore CitySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 708Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0686Health Insurance - Coverage for Over-the-Counter Contraceptive Drugs and DevicesSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0744
    (HB0780)
Insurance – Contraceptive Coverage – Consumer InformationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0774 / CH0465
    (HB0994 / CH0464)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning ServicesSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.