Rescue Squads

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0019Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0100 / CH0154
    (SB0597 / CH0153)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0111
    (SB0105)
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of RevenueSt. Mary's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0170Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0175Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0231 / CH0174Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - AlterationsDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0388
    (SB0322)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0571
    (SB0282 / CH0173)
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0750Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of DwellingBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0758
    (SB0591 / CH0695)
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue SquadsDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0881Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First RespondersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0979 / CH0686Property Tax Credit - Public Safety OfficersDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1084
    (SB1104)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1604 / CH0148Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Law Enforcement Officers and Fire and Rescue Services Members Ho. Co. 17-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 148Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0105
    (HB0111)
St. Mary's County - Fire Tax and Rescue Tax - Distribution of RevenueSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0120Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0282 / CH0173
    (HB0571)
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - AlterationsSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0322
    (HB0388)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0591 / CH0695
    (HB0758)
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue SquadsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 695Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0597 / CH0153
    (HB0100 / CH0154)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0958Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1104
    (HB1084)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1130Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and ContractsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:40 A.M.