Restaurants

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0009 / CH0252
    (SB0390 / CH0251)
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task ForceDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Health and Government Operations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0074
    (SB0260)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0301 / CH0364St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery LicenseSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0343
    (SB0128 / CH0181)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B LicenseesHarford County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0464 / CH0245
    (SB0371 / CH0244)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0649 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0672 / CH0133Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0749 / CH0387
    (SB0767)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0768Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - ProhibitionDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0800
    (SB0524 / CH0492)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0816 / CH0070
    (SB0629 / CH0069)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0901 / CH0142Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Establishments - Distance from SchoolsHoward County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1087Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage ContainersDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1122Health - Food Service Facilities - Septic SystemsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1146 / CH0669Task Force to Study Locating Businesses in Libraries in Prince George's County PG 415-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1150Prince George's County - Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading PG 313-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1217Food Service Facilities - Letter GradingDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1431 / CH0683Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Towne Centre at Laurel PG 320-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 683Economic Matters
4/8/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0128 / CH0181
    (HB0343)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B LicenseesSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0260
    (HB0074)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0307Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013Senator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0371 / CH0244
    (HB0464 / CH0245)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0390 / CH0251
    (HB0009 / CH0252)
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task ForceSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0449Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0524 / CH0492
    (HB0800)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0528Business Regulation - Shark Fin Soup - Prohibition on Sale or ConsumptionSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0629 / CH0069
    (HB0816 / CH0070)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0767
    (HB0749 / CH0387)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.