Restaurants

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0229
    (SB0186)
Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on SaleDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0522 / CH0035
    (SB0427 / CH0034)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Delegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0646 / CH0074
    (SB0453 / CH0073)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily ReceiptsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0929 / CH0144Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday SalesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 144Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1348
    (SB1035)
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017Delegate ClippingerIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1450
    (SB1039)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel LicensesDelegate WivellIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0186
    (HB0229)
Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on SaleSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0427 / CH0034
    (HB0522 / CH0035)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0445Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0453 / CH0073
    (HB0646 / CH0074)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily ReceiptsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 73Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0965Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0995
    (HB1266)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie TheatersSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1035
    (HB1348)
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017Senator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1039
    (HB1450)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel LicensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1073Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Utilities for Operation of RestaurantsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1088 / CH0099
    (HB1601)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicensesSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1186Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Cross Street MarketSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:39 P.M.