Restitution

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0278Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0565Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RestitutionDelegate HowardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0603
    (SB0490 / CH0174)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0705
    (SB0940 / CH0207)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0795Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty CasesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0921
    (SB0398 / CH0162)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1070Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - ReportDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1326
    (SB0754)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1371Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0099 / CH0026Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal ActionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 26Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0204Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0325Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0398 / CH0162
    (HB0921)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0490 / CH0174
    (HB0603)
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage ProducersSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0513Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty CasesSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0566Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public ServiceSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0735Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0754
    (HB1326)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0940 / CH0207
    (HB0705)
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly PersonsSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.