Restitution

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0190
    (SB0508 / CH0679)
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee TheftDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0410 / CH0664
    (SB0266 / CH0663)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Delegate O'DonnellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0542
    (SB0991)
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking PreventionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0659 / CH0541
    (SB0187 / CH0540)
Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - AppealDelegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0707 / CH0195
    (SB0372 / CH0194)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0721
    (SB0711)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Delegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0770
    (SB0712)
Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and ExpungementDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0775Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1213Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1257Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Provisions - RepealDelegate AdamsIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1618
    (SB1144)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Health and Government Operations
3/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0078 / CH0044State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted PrizesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0187 / CH0540
    (HB0659 / CH0541)
Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - AppealSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0266 / CH0663
    (HB0410 / CH0664)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Senator SallingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0329Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0372 / CH0194
    (HB0707 / CH0195)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0463Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and AppealsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0501Shareholders United ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0508 / CH0679
    (HB0190)
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee TheftSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0711
    (HB0721)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0712
    (HB0770)
Criminal Procedure - Nonviolent Felonies - Stet, Shielding, and ExpungementSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0732Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee TheftSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0991
    (HB0542)
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking PreventionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1144
    (HB1618)
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment ServicesSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.