Restitution

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0247 / CH0422
    (SB0963)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0995Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1225
    (SB0987)
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication is ReversedDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and TaxationJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1243Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesDelegate MoralesVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1583
    (SB0723)
Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - RestitutionDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1723 / CH0625Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate EarningsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0723
    (HB1583)
Board of Public Works - Erroneously Convicted Individual - RestitutionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0963
    (HB0247 / CH0422)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0987
    (HB1225)
State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and ConfinedSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.