Review Boards

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0257 / CH0094St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership RequirementsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0806 / CH0391Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1095Law Enforcement Officers - Disciplinary Actions - Written PolicyDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1258
    (SB1040)
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of ServicesDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1280
    (SB0677)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1296 / CH0597
    (SB0981 / CH0596)
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1313 / CH0583State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the PublicDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1511
    (SB1042)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0053 / CH0171Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested CasesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0677
    (HB1280)
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement AuthoritySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0981 / CH0596
    (HB1296 / CH0597)
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - RevisionsSenator MontgomeryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1040
    (HB1258)
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of ServicesSenator GaragiolaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB1042
    (HB1511)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.