Review Boards

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077Lean Government Advisory Board - EstablishmentDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0117 / CH0058
    (SB0190 / CH0057)
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting RequirementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0127 / CH0103Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - RepealChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0275 / CH0183Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military CultureDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0390 / CH0586
    (SB0310 / CH0587)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructureSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0957 / CH0770
    (SB0195)
State Board of Physicians - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Verification, Publication, and Notification Requirements (Janet's Law)Delegate MieleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 770Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1022Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1023
    (SB0545)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1037 / CH0598
    (SB0166)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1183 / CH0548
    (SB0986 / CH0549)
State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1292State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1356Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Entry Into Public Roadways - Regulations by Municipal CorporationsDelegate GilchristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationMunicipalities (L3)
HB1372Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot ProgramDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1536
    (SB1079)
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of PracticeDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1600 / CH0784State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing EducationDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784Economic Matters
4/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1617State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0011Correctional Services - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Composition of Hearing BoardChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0166
    (HB1037 / CH0598)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0190 / CH0057
    (HB0117 / CH0058)
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting RequirementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Finance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0310 / CH0587
    (HB0390 / CH0586)
Improving the State Procurement Oversight StructurePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0545
    (HB1023)
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1066Criminal Procedure - Modification of SentencesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1079
    (HB1536)
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of PracticeSenator BatesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1180Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.