Rivers and Streams

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0050
    (SB0464)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0055
    (SB0316)
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)Delegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0097
    (SB0005)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0155Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration ProgramDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0324
    (SB0277)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0895Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0952Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB1139Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Reduction of FeesDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1283
    (SB0960 / CH0075)
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - CompositionDelegate HammenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Environment (M3)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0005
    (HB0097)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
SB0277
    (HB0324)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0316
    (HB0055)
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0464
    (HB0050)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0960 / CH0075
    (HB1283)
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - CompositionSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.