Rivers and Streams

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0062 / CH0085Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting LicensesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0063 / CH0086Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish TrotlinesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0766 / CH0117Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0870 / CH0585
    (SB0876 / CH0584)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountyDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1110
    (SB0645)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1169
    (SB0963)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1346
    (SB0045)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0045
    (HB1346)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0061 / CH0043Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and ClarificationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0645
    (HB1110)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Allocation of FundsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0963
    (HB1169)
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - CompensationSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0001 / JR0001Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy PlanChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/1/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.