Sales and Use Tax

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0028Primary and Secondary Education - Security - School Resource OfficersDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0122Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small BusinessesDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0209Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15Howard County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0221
    (SB0073)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0261
    (SB0574)
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - ExemptionDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0594Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0726Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0837Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0875
    (SB0665)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksDelegate LongIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0903Sales and Use Tax - Exemption for Precious Metal Bullion and Coins - RepealDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0916Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0928Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of ExemptionDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0958
    (SB0447)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0964Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - ApplicationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1065
    (SB0190)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1089
    (SB0196)
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1233
    (SB0763 / CH0050)
Tax Amnesty ProgramDelegate WalkerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0073
    (HB0221)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0190
    (HB1065)
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - AccommodationsSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0196
    (HB1089)
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0447
    (HB0958)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0574
    (HB0261)
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - ExemptionSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0589
    (HB0483)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0665
    (HB0875)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0763 / CH0050
    (HB1233)
Tax Amnesty ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0789Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library ServicesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.