Scholarships and Student Financial Aid

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0085
    (SB0050)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education AwardDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/23/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0289Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians - Participation in a Consumer Operated and Oriented Plan (CO-OP) NetworkDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0329
    (SB0889)
Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award and Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship - QualificationsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0526 / CH0374Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and FundingDelegate SummersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
HB0557
    (SB0607)
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial InformationDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAppropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0601Education - Loan Assistance - Professional Counselors and Alcohol and Drug CounselorsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0827Environment - Water Supply and Wastewater Infrastructure - FundDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0831 / CH0564
    (SB0828 / CH0563)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013Delegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0963 / CH0395Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship ProgramsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1012 / CH0260
    (SB0414 / CH0259)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1013
    (SB0543)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1272
    (SB0964)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1342 / CH0678Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data TransfersDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1439
    (SB0924)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Catonsville Clubhouse RenovationsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0050
    (HB0085)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Segal AmeriCorps Education AwardSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0054 / CH0172Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical AlterationsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 172Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0111Education - General Assembly Scholarships - Modification of ProgramsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0414 / CH0259
    (HB1012 / CH0260)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0543
    (HB1013)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0607
    (HB0557)
Institutions of Higher Education - Student Notification - Financial InformationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0812Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0828 / CH0563
    (HB0831 / CH0564)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0889
    (HB0329)
Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award and Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship - QualificationsSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0924
    (HB1439)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Catonsville Clubhouse RenovationsSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0964
    (HB1272)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.