School Administration

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0103Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County SuperintendentsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0184Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0185Prince George’s County Board of Education – Students With a Disability in Prince George’s County Public Schools – Report PG 506–18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0207Prince George's County Board of Education - Governance PG 509-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0211Prince George's County Board of Education - Teachers and Administrators - Child Protective Services Investigation Findings PG 510-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0214Prince George's County - Equality in Education Act PG 505-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0617
    (SB0562)
Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School EmployeesDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0668Pediatric Stroke Awareness Month - Awareness, Training, and Resource MaterialsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0709Education - County Boards of Education - County Superintendent ContractsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0811
    (SB0819)
Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee ProcessingDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0999Baltimore City - Chief Executive Officer of the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Title ChangeDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1084Calvert County - County Superintendent of Schools - Postemployment Compensation and BenefitsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1324Howard County Board of Education - Superintendent of Schools - Term Length Ho. Co. 11-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1571Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1712
    (SB1162)
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and ReappointmentWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1720Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and PoliciesDelegate PattersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1758
    (SB0639)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0326Education – Public School Opportunities Enhancement Program – Administration ResourcesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0469Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0562
    (HB0617)
Education - Assessments - Administration by Public School EmployeesSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0639
    (HB1758)
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing ProceduresSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0678State Department of Education - Employment Categories and PracticesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0725Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation - Civil Relief and School ResponseSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0819
    (HB0811)
Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee ProcessingSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0904Public Schools – Social Media Use by EducatorsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1105Baltimore County - Superintendent of Schools - Prohibition on Other EmploymentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesJuvenile Law (E3)
SB1162
    (HB1712)
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and ReappointmentWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1213Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and ExpulsionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

February 24, 2018 11:56 A.M.