School Buses

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0125
    (SB0120)
Harford County - School Buses - Length of OperationDelegate McComasIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0471School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0510 / CH0427Montgomery County - Education - School Bus - Doors That Lock MC 27-15Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1025School Vehicles - Right Turn on Red - ProhibitionDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0120
    (HB0125)
Harford County - School Buses - Length of OperationHarford County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.