School Buses

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0073
    (SB0210)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0461
    (SB0388)
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and FundingSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0681Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0750Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary StandardsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1360
    (SB0756)
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1473Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat BeltsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1486Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0083 / CH0529Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement FundChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0210
    (HB0073)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0388
    (HB0461)
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and FundingPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0520 / CH0397
    (HB0756)
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and RefundWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0756
    (HB1360)
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)Senator MadalenoIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.